U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:14-cv-00096
  • Case Name: Van Buggenum Limited Partnership v. Denbury Onshore LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2016
  • September 13, 2016: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • September 12, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
October, 2015
  • October 06, 2015: [Scheduling Conference]
  • October 06, 2015: [Staying Case]
September, 2015
  • September 26, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 26, 2015: [~Set Deadlines/Hearings]
February, 2015
  • February 27, 2015: [Stay Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.