U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00028
  • Case Name: Ottersbach v. Community Health Center of Central Wyoming et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • March 28, 2016: [Dismiss Case]
February, 2016
  • February 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: [Order]
  • January 28, 2016: [Notice of Settlement Conference]
  • January 27, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 25, 2016: [Stipulation of Facts]
  • January 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue (Dispositive)]
  • January 11, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 11, 2016: [Continue (Dispositive)]
  • January 08, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 04, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2015
  • December 28, 2015: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 14, 2015: [Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
  • December 14, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 14, 2015: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • December 01, 2015: [Status Conference]
November, 2015
  • November 24, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 23, 2015: [Order]
  • November 17, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 17, 2015: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • November 17, 2015: [Status Conference]
  • November 11, 2015: [Response]
  • November 09, 2015: [~Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 09, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 09, 2015: [Order]
  • November 06, 2015: [Return of Subpoena]
  • November 06, 2015: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • November 06, 2015: [Quash]
October, 2015
  • October 23, 2015: [Designation of Experts]
  • October 09, 2015: [Designation of Experts]
March, 2015
  • March 02, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.