U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:14-cv-00190
  • Case Name: Martin v. Cyclone Drilling Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2016
  • April 21, 2016: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • April 21, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
March, 2016
  • March 28, 2016: [Notice of Settlement]
  • March 24, 2016: [~Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 24, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 22, 2016: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 09, 2016: [Settlement Conference]
  • March 02, 2016: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • March 01, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • February 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • February 22, 2016: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • February 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • February 09, 2016: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • February 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • February 01, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 01, 2016: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
January, 2016
  • January 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 25, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 25, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • January 23, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 19, 2016: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • January 18, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • January 18, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 18, 2016: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • January 12, 2016: [Statement]
  • January 12, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 12, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
December, 2015
  • December 11, 2015: [Designation of Experts]
  • December 01, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • November 18, 2015: [Designation of Experts]
  • November 13, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 12, 2015: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
October, 2015
  • October 23, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 23, 2015: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • October 16, 2015: [Designation of Experts]
  • October 05, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
July, 2015
  • July 29, 2015: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 16, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
June, 2015
  • June 23, 2015: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • June 23, 2015: [Status Conference]
  • June 15, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 15, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • June 15, 2015: [Notice of Complexity]
  • June 15, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 15, 2015: [Notice of Status Conference]
March, 2015
  • March 12, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.