U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:14-cv-00193
  • Case Name: Gage et al v. Buffets Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 03, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 13, 2020: [Status Report]
March, 2020
  • March 28, 2020: [Status Report]
  • March 10, 2020: [Order]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Status Report]
  • September 09, 2019: [Status Report Order]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Status Report]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Status Report]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Status Report]
March, 2016
  • March 16, 2016: [Suggestion of Bankruptcy]
  • March 08, 2016: [Return of Subpoena]
  • March 07, 2016: [Order]
February, 2016
  • February 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • February 19, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • February 12, 2016: [Preliminary Injunction]
January, 2016
  • January 26, 2016: [Transcript]
  • January 19, 2016: [Objection]
  • January 12, 2016: [Supplement]
  • January 11, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 07, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
December, 2015
  • December 22, 2015: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • December 21, 2015: [Response]
  • December 16, 2015: [Return of Subpoena]
  • December 16, 2015: [Request for Hearing]
  • December 15, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 14, 2015: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • December 11, 2015: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 11, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • December 08, 2015: [Supplement]
  • December 03, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 02, 2015: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
November, 2015
  • November 20, 2015: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • November 19, 2015: [Set Aside]
  • November 19, 2015: [Order]
  • November 19, 2015: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • November 17, 2015: [Praecipe]
  • November 06, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 06, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
October, 2015
  • October 22, 2015: [Judgment]
  • October 22, 2015: [Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law]
  • October 16, 2015: [Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
  • October 09, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 08, 2015: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • October 07, 2015: [Order]
  • October 01, 2015: [In Court Hearing]
September, 2015
  • September 22, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 18, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 10, 2015: [Transcript]
  • September 02, 2015: [Status Report]
August, 2015
  • August 27, 2015: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • August 21, 2015: [Request for Hearing]
June, 2015
  • June 30, 2015: [Default Judgment]
  • June 24, 2015: [Minute Order]
March, 2015
  • March 13, 2015: [Status Report Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.