U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00039
  • Case Name: George v. Newman
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Order]
  • March 30, 2018: [Order on Mandate]
  • March 27, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
December, 2016
  • December 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2016
  • June 20, 2016: [Transcript Letter]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Clerk's Bill of Cost]
  • May 26, 2016: [USCA Order]
  • May 26, 2016: [Transcript Request (Transcripts Already on File) - Appeal]
  • May 10, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 10, 2016: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • May 10, 2016: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • May 10, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
  • May 09, 2016: [Transcript]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Bill of Costs]
  • April 21, 2016: [Bill of Costs]
  • April 12, 2016: [Judgment]
  • April 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • April 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
  • April 07, 2016: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • April 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • April 07, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 06, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • April 04, 2016: [In Limine]
  • April 01, 2016: [Stipulation of Facts]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Stipulation of Facts]
  • March 31, 2016: [Reply]
  • March 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • March 24, 2016: [Sanctions]
  • March 24, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 22, 2016: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • March 21, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 21, 2016: [Strike]
  • March 14, 2016: [Exhibit]
  • March 14, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 14, 2016: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • March 14, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 11, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 09, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 08, 2016: [Order]
  • March 07, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 07, 2016: [Alter/Amend Judgment]
  • March 07, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [- Non Public Document]
  • February 29, 2016: [Exhibit]
  • February 29, 2016: [Strike]
  • February 29, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 29, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • February 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • February 05, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • February 01, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
December, 2015
  • December 24, 2015: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • December 23, 2015: [Protective Order]
  • December 22, 2015: [~Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 22, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 21, 2015: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 07, 2015: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • December 03, 2015: [Protective Order]
November, 2015
  • November 19, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • November 18, 2015: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • November 16, 2015: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • November 13, 2015: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • November 06, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 05, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 04, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 28, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 28, 2015: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • October 27, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 27, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • October 27, 2015: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • October 22, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 08, 2015: [Designation of Experts]
  • October 06, 2015: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
September, 2015
  • September 29, 2015: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • September 17, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 17, 2015: [Praecipe]
  • September 17, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • September 14, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 08, 2015: [Designation of Experts]
August, 2015
  • August 27, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 26, 2015: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
July, 2015
  • July 06, 2015: [Initial Pretrial Order]
March, 2015
  • March 16, 2015: [Praecipe]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.