U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00036
  • Case Name: Garling et al v. United States Environmental Protection Agency
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 22, 2017: [Dismissing Case]
  • May 22, 2017: [Order on Mandate]
  • May 16, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
  • May 05, 2017: [USCA Order]
June, 2016
  • June 03, 2016: [Transcript Letter]
May, 2016
  • May 09, 2016: [USCA Order]
  • May 09, 2016: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • May 09, 2016: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • May 09, 2016: [Appeal Remark]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [USCA Order]
  • April 12, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 08, 2016: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • April 07, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
February, 2016
  • February 08, 2016: [Judgment]
  • February 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
January, 2016
  • January 13, 2016: [Exhibit]
  • January 13, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 13, 2016: [Reply]
  • January 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
December, 2015
  • December 28, 2015: [Reply to Response]
  • December 18, 2015: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 07, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
November, 2015
  • November 25, 2015: [Reply Brief]
  • November 20, 2015: [Response]
  • November 06, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 06, 2015: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
October, 2015
  • October 26, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
September, 2015
  • September 28, 2015: [Minute Order]
  • September 14, 2015: [Order on Motion to Strike]
August, 2015
  • August 10, 2015: [Reply]
  • August 05, 2015: [Response]
July, 2015
  • July 21, 2015: [Strike]
  • July 21, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 08, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2015
  • June 16, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed-US Gov]
  • June 12, 2015: [Praecipe]
  • June 12, 2015: [Certificate of Service]
March, 2015
  • March 18, 2015: [Certificate of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.