U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:14-cv-00052
  • Case Name: Bindl et al v. Evanston Hospital Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2015
  • December 17, 2015: [Dismissing Case]
  • December 17, 2015: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • December 07, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 04, 2015: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
November, 2015
  • November 16, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • November 12, 2015: [Dismiss Party]
  • November 05, 2015: [Notice of Settlement]
  • November 05, 2015: [Status Conference]
  • November 04, 2015: [Objection]
  • November 03, 2015: [Designation]
  • November 03, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 02, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 02, 2015: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • November 02, 2015: [Proposed Voir Dire]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Notice of Joinder]
  • October 30, 2015: [Designation]
  • October 30, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 30, 2015: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • October 30, 2015: [Oral Ruling on Motion]
  • October 30, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 29, 2015: [Return of Subpoena]
  • October 28, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 28, 2015: [Notice of Joinder]
  • October 28, 2015: [Designation]
  • October 28, 2015: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • October 27, 2015: [Designation]
  • October 26, 2015: [Designation]
  • October 26, 2015: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 22, 2015: [Transcript]
  • October 21, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 20, 2015: [Return of Subpoena]
  • October 20, 2015: [Protective Order]
  • October 20, 2015: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • October 20, 2015: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • October 16, 2015: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • October 15, 2015: [Transcript]
  • October 15, 2015: [Order]
  • October 14, 2015: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • October 14, 2015: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • October 14, 2015: [Order on Motion for Jury Questionnaires]
  • October 14, 2015: [Jury Questionnaires]
  • October 13, 2015: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • October 09, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • October 09, 2015: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • October 09, 2015: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • October 09, 2015: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 08, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 06, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 05, 2015: [In Limine]
  • October 02, 2015: [Stipulation of Facts]
  • October 02, 2015: [In Limine]
  • October 02, 2015: [Brief]
  • October 02, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 01, 2015: [Motions Referred to Magistrate]
September, 2015
  • September 30, 2015: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • September 30, 2015: [Order]
  • September 30, 2015: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • September 28, 2015: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • September 26, 2015: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • September 25, 2015: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 23, 2015: [In Limine]
  • September 14, 2015: [Return of Subpoena]
  • September 11, 2015: [Quash]
August, 2015
  • August 01, 2015: [Designation of Experts]
July, 2015
  • July 31, 2015: [Designation of Experts]
  • July 22, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 07, 2015: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • July 01, 2015: [Witness List]
March, 2015
  • March 24, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.