U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:14-cv-00211
  • Case Name: Reddick et al v. Moose Head Ranch Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2016
  • January 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • January 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 11, 2016: [Dismiss]
December, 2015
  • December 07, 2015: [Statement]
  • December 07, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 07, 2015: [Summary Judgment]
  • December 06, 2015: [Statement]
  • December 06, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 06, 2015: [Summary Judgment]
  • December 04, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 01, 2015: [Notice of Settlement Conference]
November, 2015
  • November 23, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 20, 2015: [Order]
  • November 16, 2015: [Designation of Experts]
October, 2015
  • October 29, 2015: [Status Conference]
  • October 23, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 23, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 15, 2015: [Designation of Experts]
March, 2015
  • March 25, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.