U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:13-cv-00183
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Patel
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Satisfaction of Judgment]
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: [Reassigning Case]
  • January 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 26, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 26, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
September, 2015
  • September 21, 2015: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • September 21, 2015: [Judgment]
March, 2015
  • March 30, 2015: [Vacate]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.