U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:13-cv-00280
  • Case Name: Daves v. Wyoming State Penitentiary Warden
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2015
  • August 14, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 04, 2015: [USCA Order]
July, 2015
  • July 31, 2015: [Notice of Appeal]
  • July 31, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Appeal]
  • July 29, 2015: [Notice of Appeal]
  • July 29, 2015: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • July 10, 2015: [Order on Motion to Alter Judgment]
June, 2015
  • June 26, 2015: [Letter(s)]
  • June 19, 2015: [Reply]
March, 2015
  • March 30, 2015: [Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.