U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00043
  • Case Name: State of Wyoming v. United States Department of the Interior Secretary et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 06, 2018: [Order]
September, 2018
  • September 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 17, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 06, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2018
  • June 05, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
May, 2018
  • May 10, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2018
  • April 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 16, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 12, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
January, 2018
  • January 16, 2018: [USCA Order]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: [USCA Order]
November, 2017
  • November 06, 2017: [10th Circuit Filing]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: [10th Circuit Filing]
August, 2016
  • August 15, 2016: [Clerk's Bill of Cost]
  • August 12, 2016: [Clerk's Bill of Cost]
  • August 01, 2016: [Response in Support of Motion]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Response]
  • July 27, 2016: [Objection]
  • July 21, 2016: [Objection]
  • July 20, 2016: [USCA Notification]
  • July 20, 2016: [Transcript Letter]
  • July 13, 2016: [Order on Mandate]
  • July 13, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
  • July 13, 2016: [Bill of Costs]
  • July 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 06, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 06, 2016: [Bill of Costs]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • June 29, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • June 29, 2016: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • June 28, 2016: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • June 27, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • June 27, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
  • June 24, 2016: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • June 24, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
  • June 22, 2016: [Judgment]
  • June 21, 2016: [Order]
May, 2016
  • May 03, 2016: [Reply to Response]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Response]
  • April 27, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 25, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • April 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • April 18, 2016: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • April 18, 2016: [Reply Brief]
  • April 15, 2016: [Financial Entry]
  • April 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 13, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 04, 2016: [Brief]
  • April 04, 2016: [Response]
March, 2016
  • March 24, 2016: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • March 23, 2016: [Reply]
  • March 22, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 22, 2016: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 15, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • March 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 15, 2016: [Order]
  • March 11, 2016: [File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages]
  • March 04, 2016: [Permanent Injunction]
  • March 04, 2016: [File Excess Pages (Dispositive)]
  • March 04, 2016: [Brief]
February, 2016
  • February 26, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • February 10, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • February 09, 2016: [Withdrawal of Document]
January, 2016
  • January 19, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 19, 2016: [Notice of Filing Admin Record]
  • January 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 08, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 07, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • January 04, 2016: [Transcript Letter]
December, 2015
  • December 29, 2015: [Order]
  • December 24, 2015: [Transcript Request (Transcripts Already on File) - Appeal]
  • December 18, 2015: [Transcript Request (Transcripts Already on File) - Appeal]
  • December 18, 2015: [Reply]
  • December 17, 2015: [Order on Motion for Judgment]
  • December 17, 2015: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • December 17, 2015: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 17, 2015: [Reply]
  • December 15, 2015: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • December 14, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • December 11, 2015: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 11, 2015: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 11, 2015: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 10, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 10, 2015: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 10, 2015: [Notice of Appeal]
  • December 09, 2015: [USCA Order]
  • December 09, 2015: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • December 08, 2015: [Substitute Attorney]
  • December 08, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 07, 2015: [Transcript Request (Transcripts Already on File) - Appeal]
  • December 07, 2015: [Reply to Response]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Bifurcate]
  • November 30, 2015: [Expedite]
  • November 30, 2015: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 30, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • November 27, 2015: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 27, 2015: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • November 27, 2015: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • November 27, 2015: [Notice of Appeal]
  • November 23, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 19, 2015: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 17, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 16, 2015: [Reply]
  • November 16, 2015: [Judgment]
  • November 16, 2015: [Stay Case]
  • November 13, 2015: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 13, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • November 12, 2015: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • November 12, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 06, 2015: [Order]
  • November 06, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 02, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 02, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
October, 2015
  • October 16, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 16, 2015: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • October 14, 2015: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • October 13, 2015: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
September, 2015
  • September 30, 2015: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • September 30, 2015: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • September 18, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 18, 2015: [Supplement]
  • September 18, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • September 18, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 02, 2015: [Order]
  • September 02, 2015: [Errata]
  • September 02, 2015: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • September 02, 2015: [Motions No Longer Referred]
August, 2015
  • August 27, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 12, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2015
  • July 16, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 16, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 16, 2015: [Petition for Review]
  • July 15, 2015: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 15, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • July 08, 2015: [Reply]
  • July 08, 2015: [Transcript]
June, 2015
  • June 30, 2015: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 30, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 26, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 25, 2015: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 24, 2015: [Order]
  • June 24, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 23, 2015: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • June 23, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 22, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 22, 2015: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 22, 2015: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • June 22, 2015: [Intervene]
  • June 22, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 22, 2015: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • June 19, 2015: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • June 19, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 19, 2015: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 18, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 17, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 16, 2015: [Opposition]
  • June 16, 2015: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 16, 2015: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • June 15, 2015: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 15, 2015: [Reply to Response]
  • June 12, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • June 12, 2015: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • June 12, 2015: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 12, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 12, 2015: [Motions Referred to Magistrate]
  • June 12, 2015: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2015
  • April 03, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.