U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00047
  • Case Name: Town of Mountain View v. Keller Associates Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2016
  • February 17, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay Discovery]
  • February 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 17, 2016: [Scheduling Conference]
  • February 16, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • February 15, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 12, 2016: [Notice of Scheduling Conference]
  • February 12, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • February 12, 2016: [Stay Discovery]
  • February 11, 2016: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • February 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • February 10, 2016: [Protective Order]
  • February 10, 2016: [Order]
  • February 03, 2016: [Order]
  • February 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
January, 2016
  • January 08, 2016: [Reply]
  • January 07, 2016: [Reply]
  • January 05, 2016: [Notice of Joinder]
  • January 05, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • January 04, 2016: [Notice of Joinder]
  • January 04, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 04, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • January 04, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
December, 2015
  • December 29, 2015: [Order on Motion for In Camera Inspections]
  • December 22, 2015: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • December 22, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 22, 2015: [Remand]
  • December 18, 2015: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • December 18, 2015: [Reconsideration]
  • December 16, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • December 08, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 04, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • December 02, 2015: [In Camera Inspections]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Reply Brief]
  • November 23, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 09, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
October, 2015
  • October 16, 2015: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
  • October 09, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 07, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 05, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • October 02, 2015: [Order on Motion to Quash]
September, 2015
  • September 25, 2015: [Opposition]
  • September 22, 2015: [Third Party Complaint]
  • September 22, 2015: [Praecipe]
  • September 15, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 14, 2015: [Order]
  • September 11, 2015: [Quash]
  • September 10, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 03, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
August, 2015
  • August 18, 2015: [Return of Subpoena]
July, 2015
  • July 17, 2015: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • July 16, 2015: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • July 16, 2015: [Order]
  • July 15, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 06, 2015: [Joint Case Management Plan]
April, 2015
  • April 03, 2015: [Acceptance of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.