U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00049
  • Case Name: Hobby-Hall v. Kaiser Permanente Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Mail Returned]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Order]
  • May 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Letter(s)]
  • April 18, 2022: [Letter(s)]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 08, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Letter(s)]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Letter(s)]
October, 2021
  • October 04, 2021: [Letter(s)]
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [Letter(s)]
  • September 13, 2021: [Letter(s)]
August, 2021
  • August 06, 2021: [Letter(s)]
  • August 02, 2021: [Letter(s)]
July, 2021
  • July 13, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Letter(s)]
  • May 04, 2021: [Letter(s)]
  • May 04, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2016
  • August 24, 2016: [Financial Entry]
April, 2015
  • April 06, 2015: [Service of Process]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.