U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00050
  • Case Name: Cubillos v. Bridgestone Americas Tire et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2016
  • May 26, 2016: [Order]
  • May 26, 2016: [Dismissing Case]
  • May 25, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • May 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 03, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
April, 2016
  • April 04, 2016: [Notice of Settlement]
  • April 01, 2016: [Supplement]
  • April 01, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • March 28, 2016: [Objection]
  • March 25, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • March 22, 2016: [Objection]
  • March 18, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 17, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 16, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 15, 2016: [Witness List]
  • March 14, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
  • March 10, 2016: [Order]
  • March 07, 2016: [Supplement]
  • March 02, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 01, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 17, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • February 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
  • February 12, 2016: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • February 05, 2016: [Supplement]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 22, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 19, 2016: [~Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 15, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
December, 2015
  • December 30, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 30, 2015: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 24, 2015: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 23, 2015: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 18, 2015: [Reply]
  • December 18, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 18, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 18, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • December 17, 2015: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 17, 2015: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • December 16, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 14, 2015: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 09, 2015: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 08, 2015: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 04, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 03, 2015: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 01, 2015: [Designation of Experts]
  • December 01, 2015: [Order]
November, 2015
  • November 24, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 20, 2015: [Sanctions]
  • November 20, 2015: [Designation of Experts]
  • November 13, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 12, 2015: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • November 05, 2015: [Order]
October, 2015
  • October 28, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 27, 2015: [Order]
  • October 20, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 19, 2015: [Designation of Experts]
  • October 02, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2015
  • September 23, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 14, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 11, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 08, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 01, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 01, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2015
  • August 27, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 26, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2015
  • July 21, 2015: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • July 15, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 10, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 10, 2015: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • July 07, 2015: [Protective Order]
  • July 07, 2015: [Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases]
  • July 07, 2015: [Minute Order]
  • July 07, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 06, 2015: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • July 02, 2015: [Consolidate Cases for Trial]
June, 2015
  • June 26, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • June 26, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
  • June 25, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 24, 2015: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • June 22, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 22, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 19, 2015: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 19, 2015: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 18, 2015: [Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2015
  • April 06, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.