U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:14-cv-00186
  • Case Name: Energy Drilling LLC v. Pacific Energy & Mining Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • April 29, 2016: [Suggestion of Bankruptcy]
  • April 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • April 25, 2016: [Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
  • April 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • April 24, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • April 22, 2016: [Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
  • April 21, 2016: [Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
  • April 20, 2016: [Order]
  • April 20, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • April 19, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 19, 2016: [Strike]
  • April 18, 2016: [Witness List]
  • April 18, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • April 18, 2016: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • April 15, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
  • April 14, 2016: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • April 13, 2016: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • April 12, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 11, 2016: [Return of Subpoena]
  • April 11, 2016: [Oral Ruling on Motion]
  • April 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • April 11, 2016: [Application]
  • April 10, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • April 07, 2016: [Brief]
  • April 06, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 04, 2016: [Brief]
  • April 04, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 01, 2016: [Reply Brief]
  • April 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Strike]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Stipulation of Facts]
  • March 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 28, 2016: [Order]
  • March 25, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 24, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 22, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 22, 2016: [Supplement]
  • March 21, 2016: [Opposition]
  • March 18, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 17, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 11, 2016: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • March 11, 2016: [Strike]
  • March 11, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 11, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 09, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 09, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
February, 2016
  • February 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 25, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • February 23, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 23, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • February 12, 2016: [Witness List]
  • February 11, 2016: [Witness List]
  • February 11, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
  • February 09, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • February 08, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: [Order]
  • January 15, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
  • January 08, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
December, 2015
  • December 08, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 07, 2015: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 07, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
October, 2015
  • October 13, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2015
  • September 09, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2015
  • July 24, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 15, 2015: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • July 07, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2015
  • June 30, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2015
  • April 11, 2015: [Counterclaim]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.