U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00054
  • Case Name: Bates v. Wyoming Department of Corrections Director et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Judgment]
  • September 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Judgment]
May, 2016
  • May 24, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay Discovery]
  • May 04, 2016: [Stay Discovery]
  • May 04, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 19, 2016: [Letter(s)]
February, 2016
  • February 19, 2016: [Letter(s)]
September, 2015
  • September 28, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 28, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • September 14, 2015: [Judgment]
  • September 14, 2015: [Memorandum in Support]
  • September 04, 2015: [Financial Entry]
August, 2015
  • August 19, 2015: [Response]
  • August 14, 2015: [Order]
  • August 03, 2015: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • August 03, 2015: [Answer to Prisoner Complaint]
July, 2015
  • July 09, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • July 06, 2015: [Waiver of Service Executed]
June, 2015
  • June 24, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 22, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
April, 2015
  • April 13, 2015: [Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.