U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00053
  • Case Name: Abitbol v. Corizon Health Care Services Supervising Medical Provider et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2016
  • March 04, 2016: [Judgment]
  • March 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • March 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Judgment]
December, 2015
  • December 21, 2015: [Memorandum in Support]
  • December 21, 2015: [Judgment]
October, 2015
  • October 27, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 27, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 27, 2015: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 27, 2015: [Answer to Prisoner Complaint]
  • October 27, 2015: [Order]
September, 2015
  • September 22, 2015: [Order]
August, 2015
  • August 31, 2015: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • August 17, 2015: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • August 12, 2015: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2015
  • July 31, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 28, 2015: [Remark]
  • July 17, 2015: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • July 17, 2015: [Answer to Prisoner Complaint]
  • July 17, 2015: [Martinez Report]
  • July 16, 2015: [Answer to Prisoner Complaint]
  • July 16, 2015: [Response]
  • July 10, 2015: [Notice of Change of Address]
April, 2015
  • April 13, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.