U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:14-cv-00184
  • Case Name: Flores v. Menig
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2016
  • February 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • February 16, 2016: [Dismiss Case]
January, 2016
  • January 07, 2016: [Order]
November, 2015
  • November 24, 2015: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
  • November 24, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 20, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 20, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • November 20, 2015: [Witness List]
  • November 18, 2015: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • November 10, 2015: [Designation of Experts]
  • November 02, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 30, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 30, 2015: [Order]
  • October 28, 2015: [Sanctions]
  • October 21, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 20, 2015: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
September, 2015
  • September 21, 2015: [Designation of Experts]
August, 2015
  • August 14, 2015: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 13, 2015: [Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2015
  • July 29, 2015: [Order]
  • July 07, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 06, 2015: [Initial Pretrial Order]
June, 2015
  • June 29, 2015: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • June 25, 2015: [Order]
April, 2015
  • April 21, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.