U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00059
  • Case Name: Serrato v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2016
  • May 12, 2016: [USCA Order]
April, 2016
  • April 11, 2016: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
March, 2016
  • March 01, 2016: [Appeal Remark]
February, 2016
  • February 26, 2016: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • February 25, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • February 25, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
  • February 23, 2016: [Order]
  • February 16, 2016: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • February 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Certificate of Appealability]
  • February 12, 2016: [Certificate of Appealability (NOA)]
  • February 12, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
January, 2016
  • January 12, 2016: [Judgment]
  • January 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Dispositive]
  • January 12, 2016: [Order on 2255 Motion]
August, 2015
  • August 27, 2015: [Reply to Response]
July, 2015
  • July 28, 2015: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • July 08, 2015: [Response to Motion]
April, 2015
  • April 21, 2015: [Requiring Service and Response]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.