U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:14-cv-00131
  • Case Name: Locker et al v. Encana Oil & Gas (USA) Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • February 23, 2018: [Dismiss Case]
January, 2018
  • January 22, 2018: [Notice of Settlement]
  • January 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • January 10, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 05, 2018: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • January 03, 2018: [Errata]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Reply Brief]
  • December 27, 2017: [Return of Subpoena]
  • December 22, 2017: [Return of Subpoena]
  • December 20, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 20, 2017: [Setting Hearing]
  • December 20, 2017: [Vacating Hearing]
  • December 19, 2017: [Return of Subpoena]
  • December 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 15, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 12, 2017: [Reply to Response]
  • December 08, 2017: [Protective Order]
  • December 06, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • December 06, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 29, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 28, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • November 21, 2017: [Order]
  • November 21, 2017: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • November 14, 2017: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • November 03, 2017: [Status Conference]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 17, 2017: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • October 04, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 02, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2017
  • September 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • September 13, 2017: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • September 13, 2017: [Status Conference]
August, 2017
  • August 18, 2017: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • August 17, 2017: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • August 02, 2017: [Order]
  • August 02, 2017: [Status Conference]
July, 2017
  • July 20, 2017: [Reply]
  • July 17, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 10, 2017: [Quash]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 26, 2017: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • June 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • June 08, 2017: [Return of Subpoena]
  • June 07, 2017: [Supplement]
  • June 07, 2017: [Quash]
May, 2017
  • May 03, 2017: [Reply]
April, 2017
  • April 26, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 26, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 26, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • April 19, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 19, 2017: [Quash]
  • April 10, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 10, 2017: [Order]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 08, 2017: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
January, 2017
  • January 27, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 26, 2017: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • January 24, 2017: [Scheduling Conference]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • December 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
September, 2016
  • September 19, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2016
  • August 10, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay Discovery]
  • August 09, 2016: [Stay Discovery]
May, 2016
  • May 04, 2016: [Motions No Longer Referred]
April, 2016
  • April 21, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 07, 2016: [Order]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • March 29, 2016: [Vacate]
  • March 15, 2016: [Strike]
February, 2016
  • February 23, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 03, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
January, 2016
  • January 26, 2016: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • January 21, 2016: [Supplement]
  • January 20, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 15, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 12, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 11, 2016: [Quash]
  • January 05, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • January 04, 2016: [Supplement]
  • January 04, 2016: [Errata]
  • January 01, 2016: [Errata]
December, 2015
  • December 16, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 15, 2015: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 08, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 08, 2015: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 01, 2015: [Order on Motion to Compel]
November, 2015
  • November 20, 2015: [Brief]
  • November 20, 2015: [Exhibit]
  • November 20, 2015: [Response]
  • November 20, 2015: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • November 19, 2015: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • November 13, 2015: [Compel]
  • November 13, 2015: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • November 12, 2015: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • November 09, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • November 06, 2015: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [~Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 30, 2015: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Dispositive]
  • October 26, 2015: [Hearing - Dispositive]
  • October 23, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • October 23, 2015: [Brief]
  • October 23, 2015: [Summary Judgment]
August, 2015
  • August 13, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 11, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 10, 2015: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
July, 2015
  • July 06, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • July 02, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
June, 2015
  • June 17, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
April, 2015
  • April 23, 2015: [Stay Discovery]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.