U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:14-cv-00253
  • Case Name: Hoopes v. TA Operating LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2016
  • June 14, 2016: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • June 13, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
May, 2016
  • May 11, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2016
  • April 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • April 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • April 25, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 22, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 20, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • April 13, 2016: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • April 13, 2016: [Strike]
  • April 13, 2016: [Stipulation of Facts]
  • April 13, 2016: [Withdraw Document]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • March 29, 2016: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • March 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages]
  • March 29, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • March 29, 2016: [Memorandum in Support]
  • March 29, 2016: [File Excess Pages (Dispositive)]
  • March 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • March 24, 2016: [Memorandum in Support]
  • March 24, 2016: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • March 15, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 14, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 11, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • March 02, 2016: [Reply Brief]
February, 2016
  • February 24, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • February 10, 2016: [Compel]
  • February 09, 2016: [Status Conference]
December, 2015
  • December 31, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 30, 2015: [Order]
October, 2015
  • October 07, 2015: [Protective Order]
  • October 07, 2015: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
August, 2015
  • August 12, 2015: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
July, 2015
  • July 28, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • July 19, 2015: [Reply Brief]
  • July 17, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • July 06, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
June, 2015
  • June 25, 2015: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • June 19, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 19, 2015: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 18, 2015: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 18, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
April, 2015
  • April 24, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.