U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00061
  • Case Name: Lane v. Lane et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2016
  • June 01, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
October, 2015
  • October 13, 2015: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
September, 2015
  • September 03, 2015: [Appeal Remark]
August, 2015
  • August 17, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 12, 2015: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 10, 2015: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
July, 2015
  • July 20, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 20, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • July 20, 2015: [Order on Motion for Judgment]
  • July 20, 2015: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • July 20, 2015: [Response]
  • July 20, 2015: [Reply]
  • July 17, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • July 16, 2015: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • July 15, 2015: [Judgment]
  • July 10, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 10, 2015: [Objection]
April, 2015
  • April 24, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.