U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00063
  • Case Name: Asprey v. Peabody Energy Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Appendix]
  • September 25, 2020: [Affidavit]
  • September 02, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
October, 2019
  • October 03, 2019: [Appeal Remark]
  • October 02, 2019: [Transcript Letter]
  • October 01, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • October 01, 2019: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
September, 2019
  • September 18, 2019: [Clerk's Bill of Cost]
  • September 16, 2019: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • September 11, 2019: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • September 11, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Bill of Costs]
  • August 30, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 20, 2019: [Judgment]
  • August 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • August 16, 2019: [Reply Brief]
  • August 09, 2019: [Order]
June, 2019
  • June 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • June 14, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
May, 2019
  • May 08, 2019: [Settlement Conference]
  • May 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 03, 2019: [Order]
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • March 20, 2019: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
February, 2019
  • February 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • February 19, 2019: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
January, 2019
  • January 17, 2019: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • January 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages]
  • January 07, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 07, 2019: [File Excess Pages (Dispositive)]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • December 27, 2018: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • December 17, 2018: [Memorandum in Support]
  • December 17, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • December 14, 2018: [Memorandum in Support]
  • December 14, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
November, 2018
  • November 02, 2018: [Witness List]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
June, 2018
  • June 05, 2018: [Scheduling Conference Order]
May, 2018
  • May 01, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • May 01, 2018: [Order on Motion to Lift Stay]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 30, 2018: [Lift Stay]
  • April 30, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 30, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • April 24, 2018: [Dismiss Party]
  • April 05, 2018: [Status Report]
March, 2018
  • March 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 14, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 13, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 13, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 01, 2017: [Status Report]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Status Report]
  • April 10, 2017: [Minute Order]
December, 2016
  • December 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 30, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2016
  • October 14, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2016
  • April 14, 2016: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • April 13, 2016: [Suggestion of Bankruptcy]
  • April 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 12, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2016
  • March 15, 2016: [Financial Entry]
  • March 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 04, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 04, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2016
  • February 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • February 08, 2016: [Protective Order]
January, 2016
  • January 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 06, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
October, 2015
  • October 28, 2015: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • October 28, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 26, 2015: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • October 22, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
September, 2015
  • September 18, 2015: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • September 17, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 17, 2015: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • September 10, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 03, 2015: [Transcript]
  • September 01, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 01, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
August, 2015
  • August 31, 2015: [Reply Brief]
  • August 25, 2015: [Order]
  • August 20, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 19, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 10, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 07, 2015: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 05, 2015: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • August 04, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 04, 2015: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 03, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
July, 2015
  • July 23, 2015: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 16, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • July 16, 2015: [Notice of Complexity]
  • July 06, 2015: [Dismiss]
  • July 06, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 06, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 02, 2015: [Strike]
  • July 02, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 02, 2015: [Dismiss]
  • July 02, 2015: [Brief]
June, 2015
  • June 30, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • June 29, 2015: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • June 26, 2015: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 26, 2015: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • June 26, 2015: [Reassigning Case]
  • June 26, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 26, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 24, 2015: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 23, 2015: [Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2015
  • April 29, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.