U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00065
  • Case Name: Carty et al v. Scheepstra Trucking et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [Transcript]
  • July 25, 2016: [Transcript - Non Public]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • May 31, 2016: [Transcript]
  • May 31, 2016: [Judgment]
  • May 27, 2016: [Jury Verdict]
  • May 27, 2016: [Jury Question]
  • May 27, 2016: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • May 27, 2016: [Jury Instructions]
  • May 27, 2016: [Jury Trial]
  • May 26, 2016: [Jury Trial]
  • May 25, 2016: [Transcript]
  • May 25, 2016: [Jury Trial]
  • May 24, 2016: [Deposition]
  • May 24, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 24, 2016: [Jury Trial - Begun]
  • May 23, 2016: [Peremptory Challenges]
  • May 20, 2016: [Opposition]
  • May 20, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 20, 2016: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • May 19, 2016: [Order]
  • May 16, 2016: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • May 16, 2016: [Proposed Verdict]
  • May 16, 2016: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • May 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Jury Questionnaires]
  • May 04, 2016: [Jury Questionnaires]
  • May 03, 2016: [Jury Questionnaires]
  • May 03, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
  • May 03, 2016: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • May 03, 2016: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • May 03, 2016: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • May 02, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 24, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 22, 2016: [Stipulation of Facts]
  • April 22, 2016: [In Limine]
  • April 21, 2016: [Order]
  • April 21, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
  • April 19, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
  • April 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • April 13, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 07, 2016: [Order]
  • April 06, 2016: [Reply]
  • April 06, 2016: [Opposition]
March, 2016
  • March 25, 2016: [Reply Brief]
  • March 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 24, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 22, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 17, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 14, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 14, 2016: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • March 03, 2016: [In Limine]
February, 2016
  • February 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 09, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Exhibit/Witness List]
  • January 15, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
  • January 08, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
December, 2015
  • December 07, 2015: [Designation of Experts]
November, 2015
  • November 10, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 10, 2015: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
April, 2015
  • April 29, 2015: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.