U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00037
  • Case Name: Winston v. Prtizker et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2016
  • February 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
December, 2015
  • December 07, 2015: [Motions No Longer Referred]
November, 2015
  • November 18, 2015: [Hearing - Non-Dispositive]
October, 2015
  • October 23, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2015
  • July 16, 2015: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
June, 2015
  • June 26, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • June 25, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 15, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
May, 2015
  • May 07, 2015: [Praecipe]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.