U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00067
  • Case Name: Ortiz v. State of Wyoming
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2016
  • March 09, 2016: [Judgment]
  • March 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
December, 2015
  • December 07, 2015: [Reply to Response]
November, 2015
  • November 25, 2015: [Response to Motion]
October, 2015
  • October 26, 2015: [Brief]
  • October 26, 2015: [Summary Judgment]
August, 2015
  • August 26, 2015: [Scheduling Conference Order]
June, 2015
  • June 17, 2015: [Reply to Response]
May, 2015
  • May 08, 2015: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.