U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00072
  • Case Name: Federal Trade Commission v. Coorga Nutraceuticals Corp et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2016
  • September 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Judgment]
  • September 12, 2016: [Judgment]
August, 2016
  • August 17, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 17, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 16, 2016: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • August 15, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • August 11, 2016: [Stipulation of Facts]
  • August 02, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 02, 2016: [Status Conference]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Reply Brief]
  • July 26, 2016: [Reply Brief]
  • July 26, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • July 26, 2016: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • July 26, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • July 22, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 22, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 22, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 11, 2016: [Exhibit]
  • July 11, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 11, 2016: [Brief]
  • July 11, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • July 08, 2016: [Witness List]
  • July 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 06, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 30, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 17, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • June 16, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • June 13, 2016: [Request for Hearing]
  • June 13, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 01, 2016: [Compel]
April, 2016
  • April 08, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2016
  • February 22, 2016: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • February 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 09, 2016: [Reply Brief]
  • February 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 08, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 03, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
January, 2016
  • January 21, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 21, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 15, 2016: [Exhibit]
  • January 15, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
October, 2015
  • October 19, 2015: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • October 19, 2015: [Protective Order]
September, 2015
  • September 28, 2015: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 28, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
August, 2015
  • August 13, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 04, 2015: [Initial Pretrial Order]
July, 2015
  • July 10, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • July 10, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 08, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 08, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
May, 2015
  • May 13, 2015: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.