U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00075
  • Case Name: Elk Petroleum Inc v. Denbury Onshore LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2015
  • July 16, 2015: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • July 15, 2015: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • July 07, 2015: [Notice of IPT Conference]
June, 2015
  • June 24, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 24, 2015: [Counterclaim]
  • June 24, 2015: [Notice of Complexity]
  • June 24, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure]
May, 2015
  • May 15, 2015: [Notice of Complexity]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.