U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00074
  • Case Name: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. True Oil LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2016
  • October 12, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
September, 2016
  • September 16, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • September 16, 2016: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • September 16, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
July, 2016
  • July 19, 2016: [Judgment]
  • July 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • July 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • July 13, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 12, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • June 29, 2016: [Response]
  • June 28, 2016: [Witness List]
  • June 28, 2016: [Compel]
  • June 24, 2016: [Response]
  • June 23, 2016: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • June 22, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 22, 2016: [Objection]
  • June 15, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 10, 2016: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • June 08, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 08, 2016: [Strike]
  • June 08, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 08, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • June 07, 2016: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
May, 2016
  • May 12, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2016
  • April 04, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 01, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • April 01, 2016: [Status Conference]
March, 2016
  • March 28, 2016: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • March 25, 2016: [Hearing - Non-Dispositive]
  • March 22, 2016: [Witness List]
  • March 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 16, 2016: [Response]
  • March 07, 2016: [Order]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
January, 2016
  • January 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 08, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2015
  • October 15, 2015: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 15, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 14, 2015: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • October 14, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
September, 2015
  • September 29, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • September 29, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
August, 2015
  • August 07, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 06, 2015: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
July, 2015
  • July 28, 2015: [Stipulation of Consent to Trial Before Magistrate Judge]
  • July 15, 2015: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • July 15, 2015: [Jury Demand]
  • July 14, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
May, 2015
  • May 15, 2015: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.