U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00079
  • Case Name: Mrs M vs. Sweetwater County School District No 1 Director of Special Education et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2016
  • April 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 12, 2016: [Dismiss]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 29, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 16, 2016: [Vacating Hearing]
  • March 14, 2016: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Status Report]
  • February 12, 2016: [Vacating Hearing]
  • February 12, 2016: [Stay Case]
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • January 27, 2016: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • January 15, 2016: [Brief]
  • January 15, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • January 15, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
October, 2015
  • October 08, 2015: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • October 07, 2015: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
September, 2015
  • September 30, 2015: [Status Report]
  • September 21, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • September 18, 2015: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • September 18, 2015: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
August, 2015
  • August 18, 2015: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • August 05, 2015: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • August 05, 2015: [Requiring Joint Report]
July, 2015
  • July 23, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • July 21, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 21, 2015: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • July 21, 2015: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • July 21, 2015: [Motions Referred to Magistrate]
  • July 21, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
June, 2015
  • June 22, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 16, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
May, 2015
  • May 26, 2015: [Letter(s)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.