U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:13-cv-00274
  • Case Name: Krening v. Union Pacific Railroad
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2016
  • September 19, 2016: [Withdrawal of Document]
  • September 08, 2016: [Bill of Costs]
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • August 25, 2016: [Judgment]
  • August 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • August 05, 2016: [Reply Brief]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Opposition]
  • July 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 28, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 22, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 15, 2016: [Pretrial Memorandum]
  • July 15, 2016: [Brief]
  • July 15, 2016: [In Limine]
  • July 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 06, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Reply Brief]
  • May 20, 2016: [Opposition]
  • May 20, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 06, 2016: [In Limine]
  • May 06, 2016: [Brief]
  • May 06, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • May 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages]
  • May 02, 2016: [File Excess Pages (Dispositive)]
March, 2016
  • March 04, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • January 27, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
December, 2015
  • December 31, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 09, 2015: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • December 08, 2015: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • December 03, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • December 03, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
September, 2015
  • September 08, 2015: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • September 08, 2015: [Initial Pretrial Order]
August, 2015
  • August 21, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue (Dispositive)]
  • August 21, 2015: [Motions Referred to Magistrate]
  • August 20, 2015: [Continue (Dispositive)]
  • August 13, 2015: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • August 06, 2015: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • August 05, 2015: [Protective Order]
July, 2015
  • July 15, 2015: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • July 15, 2015: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • July 01, 2015: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
June, 2015
  • June 19, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
  • June 16, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • June 15, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
May, 2015
  • May 27, 2015: [Hearing - Non-Dispositive]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.