U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00084
  • Case Name: Hebert v. Sinclair Oil Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2015
  • August 17, 2015: [Order]
  • August 17, 2015: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • August 14, 2015: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • August 12, 2015: [Substitute Attorney]
  • August 12, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 07, 2015: [Joint Case Management Plan]
July, 2015
  • July 01, 2015: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • July 01, 2015: [Requiring Joint Report]
June, 2015
  • June 26, 2015: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 26, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 26, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 25, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 25, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 25, 2015: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • June 25, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • June 25, 2015: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
May, 2015
  • May 27, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.