U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:13-cv-00013
  • Case Name: Tolman et al v. Stryker Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2016
  • March 14, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
August, 2015
  • August 03, 2015: [Transcript Letter]
July, 2015
  • July 10, 2015: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • July 10, 2015: [USCA Order]
  • July 07, 2015: [USCA Case Number]
  • July 06, 2015: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • July 02, 2015: [Notice of Appeal]
  • July 02, 2015: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
June, 2015
  • June 05, 2015: [Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.