U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00090
  • Case Name: Lundahl v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2016
  • April 14, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
  • April 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 05, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 05, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Appeal]
March, 2016
  • March 14, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 14, 2016: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • March 11, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
February, 2016
  • February 16, 2016: [Judgment]
  • February 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • February 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Disqualify]
  • February 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • February 09, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • February 09, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • February 04, 2016: [Reply]
  • February 03, 2016: [Opposition]
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: [Opposition]
  • January 22, 2016: [Quash]
  • January 19, 2016: [Quash]
  • January 14, 2016: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • January 12, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 08, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 07, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2015
  • November 24, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
October, 2015
  • October 27, 2015: [Motions Referred to Magistrate]
  • October 06, 2015: [Service of Process]
September, 2015
  • September 25, 2015: [Response]
  • September 10, 2015: [Disqualify]
  • September 08, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • September 03, 2015: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • September 01, 2015: [Affidavit]
August, 2015
  • August 20, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 19, 2015: [Strike]
  • August 18, 2015: [Order]
  • August 17, 2015: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • August 14, 2015: [Strike]
  • August 12, 2015: [Minute Order]
  • August 11, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 10, 2015: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • August 04, 2015: [Reply Brief]
July, 2015
  • July 31, 2015: [Notice of Consent for Electronic Notification (Pro Se)]
  • July 28, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • July 28, 2015: [Letter(s)]
  • July 28, 2015: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • July 24, 2015: [Complaint]
  • July 22, 2015: [Order on Motion for Recusal]
  • July 21, 2015: [Opposition]
  • July 16, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 15, 2015: [Letter(s)]
  • July 14, 2015: [Opposition]
  • July 14, 2015: [Recusal]
  • July 14, 2015: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 14, 2015: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 14, 2015: [Quash]
  • July 10, 2015: [Order on Motion to Change Venue]
June, 2015
  • June 30, 2015: [Remand]
  • June 23, 2015: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • June 23, 2015: [Change Venue]
  • June 05, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.