U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00089
  • Case Name: Behrens v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2016
  • May 18, 2016: [USCA Order]
March, 2016
  • March 07, 2016: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
January, 2016
  • January 25, 2016: [Appeal Remark]
  • January 20, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 19, 2016: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • January 15, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
December, 2015
  • December 31, 2015: [Judgment]
  • December 31, 2015: [Order on 2255 Motion]
  • December 18, 2015: [Notice of Change of Address]
September, 2015
  • September 17, 2015: [Reply]
August, 2015
  • August 24, 2015: [Response to Motion]
July, 2015
  • July 14, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
June, 2015
  • June 26, 2015: [Order]
  • June 17, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 16, 2015: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • June 05, 2015: [Requiring Service and Response]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.