U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00091
  • Case Name: Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company v. A&B Builders Ltd et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: [Suggestion of Bankruptcy]
September, 2019
  • September 10, 2019: [Transcript Letter]
  • September 05, 2019: [Transcript Letter (Court Reporter Use)]
  • September 05, 2019: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • September 05, 2019: [Transcript Order Form - Court Reporter]
  • September 04, 2019: [Appeal Remark]
  • September 04, 2019: [Transcript Request (Transcripts Needed) - Appeal]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 27, 2019: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • August 27, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
  • August 23, 2019: [Judgment]
  • August 23, 2019: [Order]
  • August 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • August 23, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • August 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • August 21, 2019: [Notice of Joinder]
  • August 20, 2019: [Reply]
  • August 19, 2019: [Strike]
  • August 19, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 09, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • August 09, 2019: [Order]
  • August 07, 2019: [Order]
  • August 06, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Transcript]
  • July 23, 2019: [Notice of Joinder]
  • July 23, 2019: [Affidavit]
  • July 23, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
  • July 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue (Dispositive)]
  • July 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • July 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • July 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 19, 2019: [Reply Brief]
  • July 18, 2019: [Notice of Joinder]
  • July 18, 2019: [Scheduling Conference]
  • July 16, 2019: [Transcript Letter]
  • July 16, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • July 16, 2019: [Transcript Request (Transcripts Already on File) - Appeal]
  • July 12, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 09, 2019: [Affidavit]
  • July 09, 2019: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • July 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • July 01, 2019: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • July 01, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • June 28, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • June 28, 2019: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • June 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • June 28, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • June 28, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
  • June 25, 2019: [Bill of Costs]
  • June 25, 2019: [Affidavit]
  • June 25, 2019: [Attorney Fees]
  • June 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Dispositive]
  • June 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • June 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • June 11, 2019: [Setting Hearing]
  • June 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
  • June 11, 2019: [Judgment]
  • June 11, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • June 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • June 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Non- Dispositive]
  • June 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • June 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
February, 2019
  • February 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • February 05, 2019: [Withdraw Document]
October, 2018
  • October 09, 2018: [Reply]
  • October 02, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • September 14, 2018: [Request for Hearing]
  • September 13, 2018: [Hearing - Dispositive]
  • September 13, 2018: [Order]
  • September 13, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • September 12, 2018: [Hearing - Non-Dispositive]
  • September 11, 2018: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • September 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 24, 2018: [Reply Brief]
  • August 17, 2018: [Notice of Joinder]
  • August 17, 2018: [Brief]
  • August 17, 2018: [Reply Brief]
  • August 17, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • August 17, 2018: [Reply]
  • August 16, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • August 16, 2018: [Reply]
  • August 10, 2018: [Reply Brief]
  • August 10, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 10, 2018: [Withdraw Document]
  • August 10, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • August 10, 2018: [Opposition]
  • August 09, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 06, 2018: [Reply]
  • August 06, 2018: [Reply Brief]
  • August 02, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 01, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • August 01, 2018: [Reply]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 30, 2018: [Notice of Joinder]
  • July 27, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • July 27, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 27, 2018: [Order]
  • July 27, 2018: [Withdraw Document]
  • July 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • July 23, 2018: [Reply Brief]
  • July 20, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 18, 2018: [Staying Case]
  • July 17, 2018: [Continue (Dispositive)]
  • July 17, 2018: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • July 16, 2018: [In Limine]
  • July 16, 2018: [Reply to Response]
  • July 16, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 13, 2018: [In Limine]
  • July 13, 2018: [Brief]
  • July 13, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • July 13, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • July 13, 2018: [Order]
  • July 12, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • July 12, 2018: [Order]
  • July 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 09, 2018: [Request for Hearing]
  • July 09, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 05, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Order]
  • June 29, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • June 29, 2018: [Reply Brief]
  • June 29, 2018: [Reply]
  • June 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • June 29, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • June 28, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • June 27, 2018: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • June 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • June 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 26, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 22, 2018: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • June 21, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • June 19, 2018: [Statement]
  • June 19, 2018: [Opposition]
  • June 18, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • June 18, 2018: [Brief]
  • June 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • June 18, 2018: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • June 18, 2018: [Appendix]
  • June 18, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • June 18, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • June 18, 2018: [Opposition]
  • June 15, 2018: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • June 15, 2018: [Designation of Experts]
  • June 13, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 12, 2018: [Designation of Experts]
  • June 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • June 12, 2018: [Notice of Joinder]
  • June 11, 2018: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • June 11, 2018: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Supplement]
  • May 30, 2018: [Sanctions]
  • May 30, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • May 30, 2018: [Appendix]
  • May 30, 2018: [Order]
  • May 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • May 24, 2018: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • May 24, 2018: [Motions Referred to Magistrate]
  • May 23, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • May 23, 2018: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • May 23, 2018: [Exhibit]
  • May 21, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • May 21, 2018: [Designation of Experts]
  • May 16, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • May 16, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 16, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • May 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • May 11, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
April, 2018
  • April 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
March, 2018
  • March 14, 2018: [Request for Hearing]
  • March 14, 2018: [Reply to Response]
  • March 07, 2018: [Opposition]
  • March 02, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 23, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • February 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • February 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 12, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • February 09, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • February 09, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • February 09, 2018: [Transcript]
  • February 07, 2018: [Reconsideration]
January, 2018
  • January 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 08, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
December, 2017
  • December 19, 2017: [Order]
  • December 12, 2017: [Return of Subpoena]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • November 08, 2017: [Order]
  • November 07, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Order]
  • October 31, 2017: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • October 31, 2017: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • October 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 27, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • October 16, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • October 13, 2017: [Notice of Joinder]
  • October 13, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 13, 2017: [File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Non-Dispositive)]
  • October 13, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • October 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 13, 2017: [Order]
  • October 12, 2017: [Order]
  • October 11, 2017: [Compel]
  • October 11, 2017: [Protective Order]
September, 2017
  • September 25, 2017: [Order]
August, 2017
  • August 17, 2017: [Order]
  • August 07, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • August 07, 2017: [Reply Brief]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • July 18, 2017: [Compel]
  • July 17, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
June, 2017
  • June 20, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • June 15, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
May, 2017
  • May 12, 2017: [Reply Brief]
  • May 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 05, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • May 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • May 03, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • May 03, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
April, 2017
  • April 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 21, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • April 17, 2017: [Leave to]
  • April 14, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 13, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • April 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • April 11, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 11, 2017: [Leave to]
  • April 11, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • April 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 10, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 06, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 06, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 04, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 29, 2017: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 29, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 23, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • March 17, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 16, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 08, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 03, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 02, 2017: [Notice to Take Deposition]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 08, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Financial Entry]
  • January 26, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 26, 2017: [Payment Entry]
  • January 26, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
December, 2016
  • December 08, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 07, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
November, 2016
  • November 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 15, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • November 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 04, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • November 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
October, 2016
  • October 03, 2016: [Transcript]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Reply Brief]
  • September 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • September 20, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • September 19, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • September 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 16, 2016: [Opposition]
  • September 16, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 16, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 16, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • September 13, 2016: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • September 12, 2016: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • September 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 09, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 07, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 02, 2016: [Objection]
  • September 02, 2016: [Protective Order]
  • September 02, 2016: [File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Dispositive)]
  • September 02, 2016: [Compel]
  • September 02, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 01, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 01, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 01, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • August 29, 2016: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 22, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue (Dispositive)]
July, 2016
  • July 13, 2016: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • July 12, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 12, 2016: [Order]
  • July 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Dispositive]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 28, 2016: [Hearing - Dispositive]
  • June 28, 2016: [Request for Hearing]
May, 2016
  • May 20, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • May 19, 2016: [Reply Brief]
  • May 18, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 18, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • May 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages]
  • May 12, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 10, 2016: [File Excess Pages (Dispositive)]
  • May 09, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • May 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • May 09, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • May 09, 2016: [Opposition]
  • May 09, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 09, 2016: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Praecipe]
  • April 27, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • April 26, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • April 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 25, 2016: [Order]
  • April 25, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • April 25, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 15, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • April 15, 2016: [Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
  • April 14, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
March, 2016
  • March 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 02, 2016: [Reply]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Opposition]
  • February 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 17, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • February 16, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
January, 2016
  • January 07, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
December, 2015
  • December 31, 2015: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • December 30, 2015: [Protective Order]
  • December 21, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 21, 2015: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
November, 2015
  • November 28, 2015: [Transcript]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • October 30, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 22, 2015: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • October 22, 2015: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • October 15, 2015: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • October 15, 2015: [Order]
September, 2015
  • September 01, 2015: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
August, 2015
  • August 28, 2015: [Vacate]
  • August 18, 2015: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • August 18, 2015: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • August 05, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 04, 2015: [Answer to Crossclaim]
  • August 04, 2015: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • August 03, 2015: [Answer to Crossclaim]
July, 2015
  • July 31, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 31, 2015: [Answer to Crossclaim]
  • July 30, 2015: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • July 15, 2015: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • July 15, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 14, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 14, 2015: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 13, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • July 13, 2015: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 13, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 13, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 13, 2015: [Crossclaim]
  • July 13, 2015: [Counterclaim]
  • July 09, 2015: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 09, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
June, 2015
  • June 23, 2015: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • June 05, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.