U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:14-cv-00048
  • Case Name: Claycomb v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • December 09, 2019: [10th Circuit Filing]
September, 2016
  • September 12, 2016: [USCA Order]
March, 2016
  • March 01, 2016: [USCA Notification]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
January, 2016
  • January 22, 2016: [Appeal Remark]
December, 2015
  • December 22, 2015: [Appeal Remark]
  • December 22, 2015: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 18, 2015: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • December 17, 2015: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • December 16, 2015: [Notice of Appeal]
  • December 03, 2015: [Judgment]
  • December 03, 2015: [Order]
November, 2015
  • November 05, 2015: [Reply to Response]
October, 2015
  • October 05, 2015: [Letter(s)]
September, 2015
  • September 22, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • September 21, 2015: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • September 02, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
August, 2015
  • August 27, 2015: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • August 20, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 13, 2015: [Response to Motion]
July, 2015
  • July 21, 2015: [Letter(s)]
June, 2015
  • June 10, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.