U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00068
  • Case Name: Janpol v. Wyoming Department of Corrections Director et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2015
  • October 15, 2015: [Judgment]
  • October 15, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • October 15, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
September, 2015
  • September 30, 2015: [Dismiss]
  • September 30, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 11, 2015: [Response]
  • September 11, 2015: [Answer to Prisoner Complaint]
  • September 11, 2015: [Martinez Report]
  • September 11, 2015: [Dismiss Case]
  • September 11, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 04, 2015: [Financial Entry]
August, 2015
  • August 13, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 12, 2015: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • August 11, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 11, 2015: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • August 05, 2015: [Order]
July, 2015
  • July 17, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 14, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 14, 2015: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • July 10, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2015
  • June 17, 2015: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.