U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00096
  • Case Name: Noel v. State of Wyoming
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2016
  • April 06, 2016: [Judgment]
  • April 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • April 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Judgment]
January, 2016
  • January 14, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2015
  • December 21, 2015: [Reply to Response]
  • December 15, 2015: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages]
  • December 09, 2015: [File Excess Pages (Dispositive)]
  • December 07, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 07, 2015: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
November, 2015
  • November 04, 2015: [Judgment]
  • November 04, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 04, 2015: [Summary Judgment]
  • November 03, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 22, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 22, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 22, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
August, 2015
  • August 31, 2015: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • August 28, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 28, 2015: [Response]
July, 2015
  • July 14, 2015: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
June, 2015
  • June 25, 2015: [Dismissing Case]
  • June 19, 2015: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.