U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00098
  • Case Name: Marchione v. Chevron Mining Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2016
  • March 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 09, 2016: [Dismiss]
January, 2016
  • January 05, 2016: [~Set Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2015
  • December 30, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 29, 2015: [Order]
  • December 22, 2015: [Settlement Conference]
August, 2015
  • August 19, 2015: [Initial Pretrial Order]
July, 2015
  • July 28, 2015: [Stipulation of Consent to Trial Before Magistrate Judge]
  • July 28, 2015: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • July 15, 2015: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • July 14, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 14, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure]
June, 2015
  • June 23, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 22, 2015: [Complaint]
  • June 22, 2015: [Praecipe]
  • June 22, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 22, 2015: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • June 22, 2015: [Jury Demand]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.