U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00099
  • Case Name: Chouinard et al v. National Park Service Director et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2015
  • August 10, 2015: [Dismissing Case]
July, 2015
  • July 30, 2015: [Withdrawal of Document]
  • July 22, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 20, 2015: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • July 20, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 20, 2015: [Petition for Review]
  • July 14, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 07, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
June, 2015
  • June 25, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 24, 2015: [Petition for Review]
  • June 24, 2015: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.