U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00100
  • Case Name: Washington National Insurance Company v. Bennington et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Financial Entry]
  • May 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 19, 2016: [Order]
April, 2016
  • April 20, 2016: [Judgment]
  • April 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • April 18, 2016: [Stipulation of Facts]
  • April 14, 2016: [Reply Brief]
  • April 05, 2016: [Exhibit]
  • April 04, 2016: [Vacating Hearing]
  • April 01, 2016: [Response to Motion]
March, 2016
  • March 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • March 25, 2016: [Reply]
  • March 25, 2016: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • March 14, 2016: [Statement]
  • March 11, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 11, 2016: [Notice of Compliance with Court Order]
January, 2016
  • January 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • January 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • January 06, 2016: [Default Judgment]
  • January 06, 2016: [Reply]
  • January 05, 2016: [Response to Motion]
December, 2015
  • December 31, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • December 14, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 14, 2015: [Dismiss Party]
  • December 14, 2015: [Summary Judgment]
  • December 14, 2015: [Default Judgment]
  • December 11, 2015: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • December 04, 2015: [Joint Case Management Plan]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Stipulation of Consent to Trial Before Magistrate Judge]
  • November 25, 2015: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • November 13, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 03, 2015: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
September, 2015
  • September 21, 2015: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • September 14, 2015: [Entry of Default]
  • September 14, 2015: [Default Judgment]
August, 2015
  • August 31, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 25, 2015: [Letter(s)]
  • August 20, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 20, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 20, 2015: [Counterclaim]
  • August 06, 2015: [Praecipe]
July, 2015
  • July 24, 2015: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • July 22, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 15, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 14, 2015: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 07, 2015: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • July 02, 2015: [Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds]
June, 2015
  • June 30, 2015: [Complaint]
  • June 30, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • June 30, 2015: [Disbursement of Funds]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.