U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00102
  • Case Name: Ellbogen Property Management LTD and UBM Properties LLC v. Chesapeake Exploration LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2015
  • July 23, 2015: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • July 23, 2015: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • July 14, 2015: [Withdraw Document]
  • July 09, 2015: [Order]
  • July 06, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 02, 2015: [Notice of Removal]
  • July 02, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 02, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.