U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00104
  • Case Name: Charles et al v. Parfrey
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2016
  • September 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 09, 2016: [Dismiss]
August, 2016
  • August 05, 2016: [In Limine]
June, 2016
  • June 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • June 13, 2016: [Minute Order]
  • June 13, 2016: [~Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 10, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue (Dispositive)]
  • June 09, 2016: [Continue (Dispositive)]
  • June 09, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • May 27, 2016: [Order]
  • May 27, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 27, 2016: [Quash]
  • May 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • May 12, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 11, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
  • May 11, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • May 04, 2016: [Opposition]
  • May 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Withdraw Document]
  • April 29, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
  • April 25, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 25, 2016: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • April 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • April 13, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • April 08, 2016: [Judgment]
  • April 08, 2016: [Stipulation of Facts]
  • April 06, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 06, 2016: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • April 05, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2016
  • March 24, 2016: [Status Conference]
November, 2015
  • November 10, 2015: [Initial Pretrial Order]
October, 2015
  • October 27, 2015: [Notice of IPT Conference]
September, 2015
  • September 23, 2015: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • September 17, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 03, 2015: [Notice of IPT Conference]
August, 2015
  • August 28, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 28, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 28, 2015: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
July, 2015
  • July 07, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.