U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00103
  • Case Name: McCoy v. State of Wyoming et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2017
  • April 19, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
December, 2016
  • December 12, 2016: [Appeal Remark]
  • December 12, 2016: [Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA]
  • December 02, 2016: [USCA Order]
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [USCA Notification]
  • November 21, 2016: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
October, 2016
  • October 11, 2016: [Appeal Remark]
  • October 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 11, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 07, 2016: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • October 07, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 07, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Appeal]
  • October 07, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • September 26, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • September 06, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 06, 2016: [Judgment]
  • September 06, 2016: [Dismissing Case]
August, 2016
  • August 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • August 16, 2016: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • August 15, 2016: [Reconsideration]
July, 2016
  • July 21, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 14, 2016: [Opposition]
  • July 13, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
June, 2016
  • June 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
May, 2016
  • May 19, 2016: [Brief]
  • May 19, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 02, 2016: [Memorandum in Support]
  • May 02, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • May 02, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 02, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
April, 2016
  • April 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • April 05, 2016: [Reconsideration]
March, 2016
  • March 09, 2016: [Dismissing Case]
January, 2016
  • January 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • January 13, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • January 13, 2016: [Reconsideration]
December, 2015
  • December 03, 2015: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 25, 2015: [Reconsideration]
October, 2015
  • October 29, 2015: [Order]
  • October 26, 2015: [Entry of Default]
  • October 15, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 07, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
July, 2015
  • July 07, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.