U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00105
  • Case Name: Juarez v. Standard Drywall Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2016
  • August 16, 2016: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • August 16, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • August 15, 2016: [Dismiss]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Minute Order]
  • July 25, 2016: [Transcript]
  • July 22, 2016: [Trial Brief]
  • July 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • July 20, 2016: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • July 20, 2016: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • July 19, 2016: [Withdraw Document]
  • July 19, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 19, 2016: [Minute Order]
  • July 18, 2016: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • July 18, 2016: [Hearing - Non-Dispositive]
  • July 14, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 13, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • July 12, 2016: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • July 12, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 08, 2016: [In Limine]
  • July 08, 2016: [Transcript]
  • July 07, 2016: [Stipulation of Facts]
  • July 07, 2016: [In Limine]
  • July 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • July 05, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 01, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Compel]
  • June 28, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • June 27, 2016: [Reply Brief]
  • June 24, 2016: [Exhibit]
  • June 24, 2016: [Errata]
  • June 24, 2016: [Order on Motion to File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Dispositive)]
  • June 24, 2016: [Response]
  • June 23, 2016: [File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Dispositive)]
  • June 23, 2016: [Order]
  • June 16, 2016: [Exhibit]
  • June 16, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • June 08, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • June 07, 2016: [Brief]
  • June 01, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Compel]
  • May 31, 2016: [Order]
  • May 31, 2016: [Request for Hearing]
  • May 31, 2016: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • May 31, 2016: [Transcript]
  • May 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • May 11, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • April 27, 2016: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • April 25, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 25, 2016: [Request for Hearing]
  • April 22, 2016: [Notice of Settlement Conference]
  • April 22, 2016: [Order]
  • April 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for In Camera Inspections]
  • April 21, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 18, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • April 15, 2016: [Witness List]
  • April 15, 2016: [Response]
  • April 12, 2016: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • April 07, 2016: [Settlement Conference]
  • April 06, 2016: [Exhibit]
  • April 06, 2016: [Response]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 29, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 23, 2016: [Protective Order]
  • March 19, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 18, 2016: [Protective Order]
  • March 18, 2016: [In Camera Inspections]
  • March 16, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
  • March 14, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 14, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 08, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 07, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 02, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
February, 2016
  • February 22, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Non- Dispositive]
  • February 22, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • February 22, 2016: [Hearing - Non-Dispositive]
  • February 22, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • February 12, 2016: [Order]
January, 2016
  • January 15, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
October, 2015
  • October 15, 2015: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • October 14, 2015: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • October 07, 2015: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
September, 2015
  • September 03, 2015: [Notice of IPT Conference]
August, 2015
  • August 31, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2015
  • July 21, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 20, 2015: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 07, 2015: [Complaint]
  • July 07, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 07, 2015: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • July 07, 2015: [Praecipe]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.