U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00106
  • Case Name: Real Bird et al v. KCPK Trucking Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2016
  • August 08, 2016: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • August 05, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • August 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • August 01, 2016: [Status Report]
June, 2016
  • June 06, 2016: [Quash]
  • June 06, 2016: [Order]
May, 2016
  • May 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 22, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • May 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 19, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
April, 2016
  • April 08, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
  • April 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • April 01, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Dismissing Party]
  • March 25, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • March 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • March 18, 2016: [Motions Referred to Magistrate]
  • March 16, 2016: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • March 08, 2016: [Hearing - Dispositive]
  • March 08, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 08, 2016: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • March 08, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
February, 2016
  • February 25, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 10, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • February 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 08, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
January, 2016
  • January 22, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 21, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
October, 2015
  • October 16, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 15, 2015: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
September, 2015
  • September 22, 2015: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • September 22, 2015: [Initial Pretrial Order]
August, 2015
  • August 01, 2015: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • August 01, 2015: [Requiring Joint Report]
July, 2015
  • July 31, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 31, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 17, 2015: [Acceptance of Service]
  • July 07, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.