U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00109
  • Case Name: Black v. Tristar Constructors Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2016
  • August 09, 2016: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • August 08, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
June, 2016
  • June 15, 2016: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • June 14, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • June 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • June 13, 2016: [Dismiss Party]
  • June 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • June 08, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
April, 2016
  • April 14, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • April 14, 2016: [Reassigning Case]
  • April 14, 2016: [Stipulation of Consent to Trial Before Magistrate Judge]
March, 2016
  • March 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 16, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 16, 2016: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • March 15, 2016: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • March 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
February, 2016
  • February 26, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • February 26, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 17, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2016
  • January 08, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2015
  • December 07, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 01, 2015: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • December 01, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 01, 2015: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 30, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure]
October, 2015
  • October 14, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 13, 2015: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 07, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 07, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • October 05, 2015: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • October 02, 2015: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
September, 2015
  • September 24, 2015: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • September 21, 2015: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • September 15, 2015: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • September 15, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 11, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 10, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 10, 2015: [Praecipe]
  • September 09, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 08, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • September 04, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
August, 2015
  • August 18, 2015: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • August 17, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 17, 2015: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • August 17, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • August 17, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 11, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 07, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2015
  • July 31, 2015: [Order]
  • July 14, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 08, 2015: [Complaint]
  • July 08, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.