U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00108
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Cottonwood Creek Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2015
  • November 16, 2015: [Order]
October, 2015
  • October 15, 2015: [Stipulation]
August, 2015
  • August 20, 2015: [Consent Decree]
  • August 19, 2015: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • August 18, 2015: [Order]
July, 2015
  • July 08, 2015: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 08, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.