U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00111
  • Case Name: United States of America v. One Remington Mohawk 600 rifle et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2015
  • October 20, 2015: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • October 20, 2015: [Default Judgment]
  • October 19, 2015: [Default Judgment]
July, 2015
  • July 20, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 20, 2015: [Issuance of Warrant in rem]
  • July 13, 2015: [Order]
  • July 10, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.